THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, SELBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage and strengthen Christian belief and participation in activities related to that, and to provide resources to groups and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES PCC, SELBY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV JASON REID | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Fiona Scott | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Tranter | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elaine Patrick | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Stanley Reid | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hayes | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Slack | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Palmer | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Foster | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Palmer | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Brian Wade | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV DIANE MARY REID | Trustee | 20 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN RACHEAL SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPTAIN RICHARD MICHAEL COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.00k | £144.74k | £128.19k | £206.31k | £127.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.22k | £115.81k | £107.77k | £148.30k | £167.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £2.50k | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church
Standering Hall
New Lane
Selby
YO8 4QB
- Phone:
- 01757709678
- Email:
- cjasonreid@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window