Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH'S, LONGTHORPE
Charity number: 1131670

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV JACKIE BULLEN | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Taylor | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Patricia Gordon Ferguson Sampson | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzie Anne Robinson | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Willis | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rotondo | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Willis | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE LUCIA LAST | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saji Dominic | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Noyes | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Tate | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Medlock | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Bruce Ellingham | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Sampson | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN GEOFFREY CRAYMER | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE MAIR | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA MILLER | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS WREN | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
YVETTE VALERIE MAGRI | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE ANGELA HARWOOD CRAYMER | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.