THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF BOXGROVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 14 September 2021: Funds received from 1104062 THE FRIENDS OF BOXGROVE PRIORY
- BOXGROVE PCC (Working name)
- THE PRIORY CHURCH OF ST MARY & ST BLAISE, BOXGROVE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD IAN MICHAEL FORRESTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK PETERS | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI ELLEN GREGORY | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND WENDY JANE CRAVEN | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS SARAH ROBERTA TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA CAROLE BANNISTER | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE ANTHONY STONE | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Walter Beaman | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Philippa Nagel | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Holland | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Higgins | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Frances Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Katie Kean | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Saunders | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lara Jane Moyler | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DENYS JOHN DRAKE PULLAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID GEOFFREY BANNISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.76k | £95.70k | £118.75k | £105.59k | £107.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.77k | £103.91k | £104.73k | £110.42k | £116.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
Church Lane
Boxgrove
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO18 0ED
- Phone:
- 07368501358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window