Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF BOXGROVE
Charity Number: 1131214

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD IAN MICHAEL FORRESTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK PETERS | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI ELLEN GREGORY | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND WENDY JANE CRAVEN | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS SARAH ROBERTA TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA CAROLE BANNISTER | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE ANTHONY STONE | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Walter Beaman | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Philippa Nagel | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Holland | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Higgins | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Frances Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Katie Kean | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Saunders | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lara Jane Moyler | Trustee | 11 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DENYS JOHN DRAKE PULLAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID GEOFFREY BANNISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.