THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS LONDON FIELDS WITH ST PAUL'S HAGGERSTON

Charity number: 1130974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities: Promoting the whole mission of the Church of England within the Ecclesiastical Parish of St Michael and All Angels London Fields with St Paul's Haggerston

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £113,373
Total expenditure: £105,439

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS LONDON FIELDS PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DANIEL GERRANS Chair 04 July 2011
THE PARDOE BEQUEST
Received: On time
Mary Pullen Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Caroline Melonie Leonce Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Rebecca Catherine Marques Trustee 17 March 2024
THE PARDOE BEQUEST
Received: On time
Christina Anne Richardson Trustee 26 March 2023
None on record
Devon Lazarus Stewart Trustee 21 March 2021
THE PARDOE BEQUEST
Received: On time
SAVITRI MAITREYI MARIA HENSMAN Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Lily Chiaka Ejeka Trustee 13 March 2016
None on record
Katrina Stewart Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record
Jimmy Asakes Trustee 07 May 2014
None on record
Matthew Charles Robin Marques Trustee 22 November 2013
None on record
Catherine M SMITH Trustee 11 May 2012
None on record
Garofina Voichita MORTON Trustee 11 May 2012
None on record
Dr Margaret Eleanor Hamand Trustee 28 April 2011
THE ECKHART SOCIETY
Received: On time
GODWIN OGHOLO Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM O'LOUGHLIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £76.34k £106.52k £82.47k £113.41k £113.37k
Total expenditure £103.15k £65.94k £78.72k £79.92k £105.44k
Income from government contracts £50 £425 £425 £459 £1.02k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.13k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 06 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
97 LAVENDER GROVE
LONDON
E8 3LR
Phone:
02072492627