Trustees LOUGHBOROUGH BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1131055

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard O'Connor | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lewis | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL PEAT | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN BUTCHER | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Bowler | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rhian Green | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE GRIMLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET THIRLWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.