THE BLUEBELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support & information to individuals & families in South Cumbria, suffering distress arising from: The death of a baby before, after birth or through childhood; life-limiting or threatening illness of a baby or child; infertility, & facing difficult decision relating to pregnancy. To support children & young people up to age 18 who are grieving due to the death of someone close to them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 27 October 2009: Standard registration
- BLUEBELL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Howson | Chair | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Rogerson | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Garner | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gregory | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Gregg | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE CAIRNS | Trustee | 27 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/09/2019 | 04/09/2020 | 04/09/2021 | 04/09/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.61k | £13.35k | £29.11k | £7.14k | £20.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.39k | £14.28k | £13.83k | £16.05k | £16.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 September 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 September 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN SOUTH CUMBRIA WHO ARE SUFFERING EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTRESS ARISING FROM: THE DEATH OF A BABY BEFORE, AFTER BIRTH OR THROUGH CHILDHOOD; LIFE-LIMITING OR LIFE-THREATENING ILLNESS OF A BABY OR CHILD; INFERTILITY AND RELATED CIRCUMSTANCES; EARLY TERMINATION OF A PREGNANCY; FACING DIFFICULT DECISIONS RELATING TO PREGNANCY. 2. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 WHO ARE GRIEVING THROUGH THE DEATH OR ANTICIPATED DEATH OF SOMEONE IMPORTANT TO THEM. 3. THE PRESERVATION AND GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY ARISING FROM ILLNESS THAT MAY ARISE THROUGH GRIEF REACTIONS TO BEREAVEMENT. 4. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL EFFECTS OF SUCH A BEREAVEMENT TO PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTH CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bluebell Foundation
County Coachbuilders
Bank Lane
Barrow-in-Furness
LA14 4DW
- Phone:
- 07516556081
- Email:
- info@bluebell.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window