The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Shirley

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This PCC, has the responsibility for promoting the whole mission of the church within its parish and through the Transforming Churches agenda. This mission encompasses church services provided in the parish, the resources of the parish and the interaction between the church and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Solihull
Governance
- 29 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- Shirley PCC (Working name)
- SALTER STREET AND SHIRLEY PCC (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PATRICK AND SAINT JAMES, SALTER STREET AND SHIRLEY (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL GEOFFREY DAY | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Richard Brooker | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Richard Craig Haynes | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Terry | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Strentz | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Longbotton | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Mary Day | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr CATHERINE BARBARA CROCKER | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN HANTON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ann Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Veronica Alford | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Alison Pitt | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BELINDA MARIE PIASECKI | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH KATHARINE PENFOLD | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE GARDNER | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET FORESHEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LADBROOKE PAICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARGARET GOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JEAN WALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.98k | £123.63k | £105.75k | £156.51k | £137.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.71k | £118.62k | £105.45k | £165.75k | £147.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.70k | £4.70k | £4.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 29 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shirley Parish Office
Church House
Church Road
Shirley
SOLIHULL
West Mid
- Phone:
- 01217458896
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window