THE LAWTON TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty; advancement of education and religion and any other charitable purposes identified by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Isabelle Love | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Taylor James Mecklenburgh | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TERESA TRACEY-JANE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD ROWLAND MECKLENBURGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.83k | £98.59k | £99.82k | £103.64k | £115.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.87k | £62.66k | £112.20k | £220.62k | £103.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 4.1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE PRIMARILY IN THE BOROUGH OF WATFORD BUT ELSEWHERE AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION 4.2. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES. ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION 4.3. TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DIOCESE OF ST. ALBANS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING AND ENHANCING FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP OR SUPPORTING OTHER DIOCESAN WORKS. GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES 4.4. THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR INDIVIDUALS OR SUCH CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WATFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LAWTON TRUST
168 HIGH STREET
WATFORD
HERTS
WD17 2EG
- Phone:
- 01923 294158
- Email:
- info@lawtontrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
not.applicable
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window