SHOREDITCH TABERNACLE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1132126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Church is a meeting place where people from many cultures and backgrounds come together in a spirit of friendship and acceptance of all people's backgrounds. We seek to be of service through the Church charitable projects based in the Tab Centre complex. These projects seek to be socially inclusive for all people, providing services that target 'poverty, and discrimination.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £317,851
Total expenditure: £287,291

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JAMES OLANIPEKUN Trustee 23 October 2022
TOWER HAMLETS STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
RAINE'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (VINEYARD OF COMFORT ) EAST LONDON ASSEMBLY
Received: On time
Dickson Osagie Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Anita Nicole Barzey Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Magdalina Atkinson Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Stephen Edwin Arthur Stride Trustee 02 August 2018
COMMUNITIES & NEIGHBOURHOODS TRUST
Recently registered
REV GEORGINA STRIDE BD Trustee 02 August 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £222.39k £445.82k £163.78k £215.39k £317.85k
Total expenditure £237.62k £408.06k £188.64k £203.42k £287.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.50k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE TAB CENTRE
3 GODFREY PLACE
LONDON
E2 7NT
Phone:
02077393076