THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD ST JOHN WITH CHRIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newham
Governance
- 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S WITH CHRIST CHURCH & ST JAMES STRATFORD (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD ST JOHN WITH CHRIST CHURCH AND ST JAMES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Young Lee | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA BECKLES | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ikenga | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ballentine | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Joy Thomas-Davies | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Morohun Foluwa Mayowa Fabikun | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacintha Bridget Richards | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Omodolapo Peters | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justine Onu | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eon Wade | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chizoma Chioma Onwuka | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Quartey | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ayodele Olunloyo | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel Mark Scott | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Corin Marcia Elizabeth Barton | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chukwudi Asuoha | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN LESLIE AUBREY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr SANDRA MARIE BESSON | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JIMI PETERS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev NICHOLAS BRYZAK | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
IHINOSEN JANE OVBUDE | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Slingo | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MR TOLU BABARINSA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.66k | £177.19k | £182.90k | £231.81k | £187.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.66k | £179.31k | £166.38k | £260.22k | £173.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns C Of E Church
Broadway
LONDON
E15 1NG
- Phone:
- 020 8503 1913
- Email:
- kay.garib@stjohnse15.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window