OUR DISAPPEARING PLANET LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the public benefit the preservation and conservation of endangered animals and their habitat by making grants to charitable organisations for that purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ealing
- Hounslow
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 15 September 2009: Standard registration
- 15 November 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.83k | £139.01k | £117.97k | £123.60k | £148.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.25k | £139.27k | £120.15k | £128.37k | £154.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 June 2020 | 61 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF ENDANGERED ANIMALS AND THEIR HABITAT BY MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS FOR THAT PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window