OUGHTIBRIDGE WESLEYAN REFORM CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OWRC is a family church serving the people in the locality. We hold regular Sunday services; provide instruction in the Christian faith; hold evening groups for children and teenagers; provide support for organisations and individuals working for the advancement of the Christian faith; allow the premises to be hired by other organisations with compatible aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- OUGHTIBRIDGE CHAPEL (Working name)
- OWRC (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Edward Misiukanis | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John William Harrold Scarffe | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
PETER SHAPLAND | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher James Nicholson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Spencer Ian Yeardley | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Elizabeth Howard | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian Watson Little | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Smith | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MR MATT BROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD PETER HALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.64k | £31.59k | £35.83k | £25.88k | £9.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.08k | £49.20k | £36.95k | £8.92k | £6.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WESLYAN REFERENCE DEED 27 OCT 1898
Charitable objects
The trustees for the time being shall at all times permit the said Premises and the Chapel School or other buildings from time to time standing thereon to be used and occupied and enjoyed as a place for the Public Worship of God and for the instruction of children and adults under the direction of the Society or Church assembling for worship thereon in connection with the said Denomination or Connexion according to the Principles Constitution Usages Polity and Rules from time to time of the said Denomination and also for the promotion of such other religious, educational or charitable purposes as the said Society or Church shall from time to time direct.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Cockshutts Lane
Oughtibridge
SHEFFIELD
S35 0FX
- Phone:
- 01142864821
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window