THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF COPNOR, PORTSMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Cuthbert's PCC is responsible for co-operating with the incumbent in promoting the whole mission of the Church of England in the ecclesiatical parish - pastoral,evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 15 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST.CUTHBERT'S PCC, COPNOR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Williams | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Martin | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anita Woodcock | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Milne | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Piggot Dr | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila McKeown | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martine Clare Hebblethwaite | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Noreen Linda Jeffery | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Harry | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Hill | Trustee | 04 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Philippa Gard | Trustee | 08 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS MARY BISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ANNE WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN CRAIG PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ANTHONY SHURMER BA.HONS. | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.45k | £109.79k | £129.52k | £161.13k | £175.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.67k | £109.83k | £169.61k | £144.43k | £201.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Lichfield Road
PORTSMOUTH
St Cuthbert's Church
PO3 6DE
- Phone:
- 07765337820
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window