THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, HESSLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gemma Dee Turner | Chair | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Hardy | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Ann Brockwell | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Penelope Vernon | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jeanette Cork | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eva Alice Johansson | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deborah Jane Scott | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
GAIL Diane SEARBY | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin David Mason | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Emma Robinson | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hardy | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Shiela Dixon | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev CAROL RUTH TETLEY | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Pictor | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Philip Sheridan Rodmell | Trustee | 01 May 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.07k | £101.61k | £114.44k | £245.56k | £158.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.95k | £113.91k | £90.38k | £125.83k | £139.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church Office
The Square
HESSLE
The East Riding of Yorkshire
HU13 0AD
- Phone:
- 01482640380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window