Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SALTBURN BY THE SEA
Charity number: 1131197

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ADAM MICHAEL FREDERICK REED | Chair | 14 June 2011 |
|
|||||
Angela Smelt | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John McElheran | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Johnson | Trustee | 13 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Brignall | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Antonia Scales | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wheatley MSc DIPQA | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Joe Murphy | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Govenlock | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Payne | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE POLLARD | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE TREVILLION BRIGNALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN DOUGLAS PICTOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE FINDLAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH BRIGNALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.