THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF UPMINSTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides regular public worship open to all. The church is open every day for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral care is provided in the parish including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Support of charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Havering
Governance
- 20 November 2009: Standard registration
- PCC OF UPMINSTER (Working name)
- ST. LAURENCE'S PCC, UPMINSTER (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susannah Mary Brasier | Chair | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
LINDA LOCKWOOD | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Leaback | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony James Bloomfield | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN RICHARD MOWAT | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS THOMSON | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA PERCHARD | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEAN KEEN | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL HALE | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL LOCKWOOD | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE STEPHEN EDWARDS | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|||||
DEBORAH MARY MASTERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.02k | £227.55k | £143.34k | £209.03k | £250.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.93k | £159.90k | £197.94k | £222.34k | £374.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Tawny Avenue
UPMINSTER
RM14 2EN
- Phone:
- 01708536370
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window