Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SALE, ST.ANNE
Charity number: 1132802

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev. Canon Alison Clare Cox | Chair | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Whittingham | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Thorley | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Olwyn Eileen Marlow | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Bywater | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Hunt | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Egarr | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Egarr | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Lawlor | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE STACEY | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Hickman | Trustee | 12 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Boyle | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CATHERINE HEATH | Trustee | 22 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ADRIAN EDWARDS D.M.E. | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.