TREKSTOCK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TREKSTOCK AIMS TO PROVIDE TAILORED INFORMATION, PRACTICAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT FOR YOUNG ADULTS DIAGNOSED WITH ANY TYPE OF CANCER IN THEIR 20S AND 30S AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE TOOLS THEY NEED TO HELP GET THEM MOVING AGAIN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 November 2009: Standard registration
- TREKSTOCK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Roxburgh | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gemma Pugh | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jeancolas | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Anthony De Marco | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Stephanie Hill | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ankita Batla | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Dallas | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Owen Challis | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Eva Reynolds | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Soanes | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON LOWE | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.94k | £430.05k | £421.81k | £521.76k | £441.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £441.54k | £424.03k | £474.05k | £462.14k | £530.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.69k | £2.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £521.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £283.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £178.94k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 24 SEPTEMBER 2009 as amended on 27 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1. To advance the education of the public, in particular people in their 20s and 30s, in the subject of cancer and their needs post cancer 2. The relief of sickness and the promotion of health and wellbeing amongst those living through and beyond cancer in their 20s and 30s with a view to improving their conditions of life
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trekstock
Kingsland House
122/124 Regent Street
W1B 5SA
- Phone:
- 02073881200
- Email:
- sophie.epstone@trekstock.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window