THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ORE

Charity Number: 1131079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Public worship for all including providing sacred space for personal prayer. Upholding the sacraments of baptism & marriage. Pastoral work including visiting the sick, bereaved and taking of funerals. Teaching of Christianity. Taking of assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the Church. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £111,707
Total expenditure: £151,396

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST HELEN'S PCC,ORE,HASTINGS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Timothy Liam Bell Chair 14 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ORE
Received: On time
Jason Morton Trustee 11 May 2025
HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK
Received: On time
Julia Acott Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jennifer Summers-Day Trustee 28 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ORE
Received: On time
Andree Stevens Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Toni Carron Lee Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Rev Kizzy Anna Penfold Trustee 27 June 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ORE
Received: On time
Nicholas John Erskin Warren Trustee 17 May 2021
ICKLESHAM MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Dr Susanne Jones Trustee 14 September 2020
HASTINGS STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Linda Susan Chapman-Holmes Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Roger Campbell Pook Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Suzanne Claire Edwards Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Christine Elizabeth Aitken Trustee 29 April 2019
ST HELENS PARK PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Lynn Elizabeth White Trustee 28 April 2014
HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK
Received: On time
David Michael Walker Trustee 06 June 2013
FRIENDS OF CONQUEST HOSPITAL CIO
Received: On time
PARCHMENT TRUST
Received: On time
ST MICHAEL'S HOSPICE HASTINGS AND ROTHER
Received: On time
SARA - JANE HACKETT Trustee
None on record
ROGER JAMES MITCHELL M.A., M.ED Trustee
LOAF PROJECT
Received: On time
HASTINGS CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £137.13k £88.48k £123.09k £118.72k £111.71k
Total expenditure £107.89k £115.10k £110.59k £100.34k £151.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.20k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Helen's Church
311 The Ridge
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 2RA
Phone:
01424 754 290