Ministry Area Penybont ar Ogwr

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Entering in to the mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,600 from 10600 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
Governance
- 13 May 2010: Previously excepted registration
- COITY, NOLTON AND BRACKLA PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Ann Morgan | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Mary Blackwell | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEWIS | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Buckley | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
REV MARK PHILIP BROADWAY | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Davies | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Roger Thomas Pitman | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Goronwy Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Joy Turner | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Buckley | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Markwell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Williams | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Harrison | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Churchill Dix | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA COULSON | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Donald DAVIDSON | Trustee | 28 April 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.93k | £177.23k | £192.23k | £355.50k | £291.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.01k | £185.75k | £185.46k | £490.11k | £367.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.68k | N/A | £37.84k | £10.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920 as amended on 15 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINISTRY AREA OF PENYBONT AR OGWR
NOLTON HALL
MERTHYRMAWR ROAD NORTH
BRIDGEND
CF31 3NH
- Phone:
- 01656667690
- Email:
- MarkBroadway@cinw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window