Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRINSWORTH ST ANDREW WITH CATCLIFFE ST MARY, TREETON ST HELEN AND TINSLEY ST LAWRENCE

Charity number: 1131641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £90.81k £110.24k £90.45k £132.16k £127.81k
Total expenditure £86.97k £89.18k £97.74k £130.69k £136.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £8.35k N/A