THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRINSWORTH ST ANDREW WITH CATCLIFFE ST MARY, TREETON ST HELEN AND TINSLEY ST LAWRENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a team of four evangelical, Anglican churches within the Sheffield Diocese. Our vision is to be a church that is alive and actively engaging in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 15 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- THE RIVERS TEAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Eddie Short | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Shaw | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mercy Obinna | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caleb Satumba | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cripps | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Vickers | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Deborah Coyne | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dunkley | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Collier | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Norton | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Teal | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Short | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iris Gahegan | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Gregory | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Peats | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Cryer | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Read | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Smith | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lesley Clayton | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Leslie Barringer Revd | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA READ | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.81k | £110.24k | £90.45k | £132.16k | £127.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.97k | £89.18k | £97.74k | £130.69k | £136.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 January 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 January 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2022 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2022 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rivers Team Church Office
85 Bonet Lane
Brinsworth
Rotherham
South Yorkshire
S60 5NG
- Phone:
- 01709361630
- Website:
-
therivers-team.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window