Financial history UK FRIENDS OF THE JERUSALEM KOLLEL

Charity number: 1137944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.11k £58.79k £24.08k £38.91k £53.49k
Total expenditure £30.67k £40.96k £23.41k £50.38k £31.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A