Financial history WOODSIDE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £135.93k £100.50k £102.47k £132.06k £151.94k
Total expenditure £126.63k £96.50k £99.72k £125.15k £152.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A