Trustees WOODSIDE BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1130792

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Scarse | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karina Henry | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Scarse | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Calder | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Newson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Newson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOSES KAJUBI BA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.