THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST KEA, TRURO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Mission and Ministry to the Parish and wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST KEA PCC, TRURO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV MARC BAKER | Chair | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Batten | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Molyneux | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Knights | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Malindine | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Brown | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cooper | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Balmer | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Gavan | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanthan Alford | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIAN VICTORIA GODDARD | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hugh Nicholas Barne | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev WIlliam Francis Harwood | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Handford | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Aveline Russell | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Emms | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Charles Bridle | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Stanhope | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Ben Goddard | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.80k | £224.13k | £223.67k | £415.94k | £333.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.46k | £191.73k | £255.14k | £252.99k | £224.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £350 | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHURCH OFFICE
CHURCHTOWN
KILLIOW
TRURO
TR3 6AE
- Phone:
- 01872 262868
- Email:
- office@stkea.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window