Trustees NORTH CHEAM BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1131643

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV MIKE JACKSON BD BTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Florence Govere | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Johnson | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis John Berry | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mr Tim Raby | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Ed Dignan | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dixon IEng FIET | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Ellingham | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JOHN BATES BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.