Parochial Church Council for the Rectorial Benefice of North Cardiff

Charity Number: 1131310
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Rectorial Benefice of North Cardiff (also known as the North Cardiff Ministry Area) is a group of four churches in the Church in Wales (Anglican): St Denys (Lisvane), Christ Church (Roath Park), St Isan (Llanishen), St Faith (Llanishen). Our aim is to promote the whole mission of the Church by sharing Jesus Christ with the communities we serve.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £397,788
Total expenditure: £352,063

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cardiff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 22 February 2023: Funds received from 1133881 PARISH OF LLANISHEN
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • The Ministry Area Council of the North Cardiff Ministry Area (Working name)
  • ST DENYS LISVANE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DENYS, LISVANE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Brian Griffiths Chair 16 July 2019
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP IN THE CHURCH IN WALES
Received: On time
NORTH CARDIFF MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Rev Elaine Jenkyns Trustee 04 July 2022
NORTH CARDIFF MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Susan Anne Darracott Trustee 28 June 2022
NORTH CARDIFF MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Eleanor Williams Trustee 01 February 2022
NORTH CARDIFF MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Marilyn Susan Hillard Trustee 01 February 2022
NORTH CARDIFF MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Valerie Janette Jones Trustee 01 February 2022
NORTH CARDIFF MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Roger Paul Martin Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Sion Brynach Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Branwen Louise Abbott Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Colin William John Francis Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Anita Gibbins Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Michael Peter Arthur Smith Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Iain James Crighton Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Dr DUNCAN SHADWELL Trustee 02 January 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £263.51k £152.74k £180.93k £180.87k £397.79k
Total expenditure £150.38k £156.41k £201.63k £140.44k £352.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 March 2025 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 March 2024 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 March 2024 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Church Road
Lisvane
Cardiff
CF14 0SJ
Phone:
029 2075 2363