THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK'S HARROGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has the responsibility to promote in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has responsibilities for the church building. It seeks to promote worship; growth in faith; serving the people of the community; Christ's love and truth through witness; links with the world-wide church; justice, peace and care for creation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
225 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 07 May 2024: Funds received from 1169476 PRESENCE CHURCH (HARROGATE) UK
- ST MARK'S PCC HARROGATE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Johann Resch | Chair | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esli Natalie Lees Rev | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Rayner Booth | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Margaret Anne Dunn | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Ferguson | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Sarah Ellis | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Ruth Robinson | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Rachel Scott | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliette Grace Margaret Leyland | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Barbara Robinson | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Robert Minett | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leonora Fitzgerald Milne | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Dening | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Onslow | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Barbara Resch | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Booth | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Quinton Siddall | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gail Elizabeth Vlack | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Procter | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Alexander Duff | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Neil Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV James Handley | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Cundy | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £460.93k | £403.48k | £387.08k | £479.00k | £384.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £475.22k | £415.43k | £387.50k | £418.58k | £414.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marks Church
Leeds Road
Harrogate
HG2 8AY
- Phone:
- 01423544528
- Email:
- office@smch.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window