THE KATHARINE CHIAN FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and protect the physical health and prevention of sickness as a result of malaria amongst underpriviledged and poorer people living in third world countries such as central Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Angola
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Brunei
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Guinea
- Ivory Coast
- Liberia
- Mali
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Togo
- Uganda
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Standard registration
- 18 April 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.34k | £880 | £0 | £150 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.33k | £106 | £755 | £850 | £719 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 17 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 01 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 03 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS AS A RESULT OF MALARIA AMONGST UNDERPRIVILEGED AND POORER PEOPLE LIVING IN THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES SUCH AS CENTRAL AFRICIA.
Area of benefit
CENTRAL AFRICIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window