LINDFIELD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing regular public worship for all. Promoting the Christian faith. Teaching the faith to all ages. Providing training, nurture and activities for children and young people. Serving the community. Giving pastoral care and support to members and others in need, particularly those in sickness, distress or poverty. Providing premises and resources for community groups and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- LINDFIELD URC CHARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Margaret Franklin | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Jonathan Richard Hall | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terrance John Ward | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev KEITH JAMES MORRISON | Trustee | 28 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Daniel Ellison McQuillin | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEREMY GRAHAM PAUL CAMPLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.63k | £111.66k | £119.71k | £84.15k | £106.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.39k | £115.72k | £116.22k | £88.32k | £110.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) 01/01/1973
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
United Reformed Church
50 High Street
Lindfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 2HL
- Phone:
- 01444484364
- Email:
- admin@lindfieldurc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window