THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST AUGUSTINE'S, SCAYNES HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England and the promotion, in the ecclesiastical parish, of the whole mission of the Church - pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,357 from 2 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST AUGUSTINE'S PCC, SCAYNES HILL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Deal | Chair | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Burdett | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Ivy Ann Hite | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Leonard Whittle | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Sidey Martin | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brightey | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Maidment | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steve Argent | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Martin | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Deal | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harding | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Caroline Louise Smith | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE PROSSER WATKINS | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan White | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brett | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNY DOREEN WALKER | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.87k | £79.53k | £91.07k | £114.80k | £165.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.32k | £76.30k | £107.20k | £114.69k | £157.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.81k | N/A | £9.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Augustine's church
Church Road
Scaynes Hill
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH17 7NY
- Phone:
- 01444 831013
- Email:
- sash.parishoffice@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window