TRUST IN LEARNING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Charity is the furtherance and promotion of the education of the pupils at any school which the Charity acts or has acted as a foundation, the advancement of education through the provision of vocational training, and the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of facilities for leisure and sporting activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bristol City
Governance
- 25 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Elliott | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £13 | £13 | £13 | £13 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 June 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/09/2015
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOL WHICH IS A QUALIFYING SCHOOL, AN ACADEMY, OR AT ANY OTHER SCHOOL IN RESPECT OF WHICH THE COMPANY ACTS OR HAS ACTED AS A FOUNDATION; 2. ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING; AND 3. PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES, IT BEING ACKNOWLEDGED THAT IN CARRYING OUT THE OBJECTS THE COMPANY MUST HAVE REGARD TO ITS OBLIGATION TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY COHESION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trust House
Teyfant Road
Bristol
BS13 0RG
- Phone:
- 01173773442
- Email:
- cvirtue@tila.school
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window