Financial history HARLOW & SURROUNDING AREAS UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1132663
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £42.68k £80.91k £80.37k £3.46k £13.59k
Total expenditure £38.57k £80.99k £98.95k £7.03k £19.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A