THE PARISH OF STANLEY AND SOUTH MOOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
Governance
- 26 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREW'S STANLEY (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, STANLEY (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brenda Moiser | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh King | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Perkins | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Stoker | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bland | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ramage | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hetherington | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare King | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Moscardini | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hindhaugh | Trustee | 28 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Robinson | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Patterson | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELDERS HINDHAUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHRYN JOAN ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.11k | £29.24k | £67.70k | £54.00k | £53.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.91k | £67.86k | £76.08k | £73.64k | £62.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/05/2015
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 The Barns
STANLEY
DH9 8BN
- Phone:
- 01207237715
- Email:
- st.andtreas@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window