THE CROMWELL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to advance the education of the public in both the life and legacy of Oliver Cromwell (1599-1658), politician, soldier and statesman, and the wider history of the seventeenth century. The activities include supporting plaques at sites linked to Cromwell, the publication of information, the organisation of day schools, conferences and an annual service of commemoration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GOLDSMITH BA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hemsley Hardy | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Waseem Ahmed | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Warren | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Parsonson Young | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Robbins | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR ISMINI PELLS MA, MPhil | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Miranda Malins MPhil,PhD | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Jonathan Fitzgibbons | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Serrie Meakins | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY BUSH | Trustee | 12 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NEWLAND BA HONS MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MAXINE FORSHAW BSC, PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.73k | £13.23k | £15.07k | £12.05k | £16.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.07k | £12.73k | £16.20k | £11.86k | £16.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APR 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 MAY 2017 as amended on 24 Apr 2021 as amended on 24 Apr 2021 as amended on 24 Apr 2021 as amended on 24 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BOTH THE LIFE AND LEGACY OF OLIVER CROMWELL (1599-1658), POLITICIAN, SOLDIER AND STATESMAN, AND THE WIDER HISTORY OF THE SEVENTEENTH CENTURY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swatchford Cottage
Lower Kingsbury
Milborne Port
SHERBORNE
Somerset
DT9 5ED
- Phone:
- 01223262944
- Email:
- enquiries@olivercromwell.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window