Financial history CASTLE SCHOOL (CAMBRIDGE) CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1139105
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £47.20k £89.20k £56.31k £36.06k £53.72k
Total expenditure £5.89k £70.88k £21.44k £41.26k £111.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A