CASTLE SCHOOL (CAMBRIDGE) CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils attending Castle School by providing educational assistance, facilities, support and services not normally provided by the Local Authority. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for educational, recreational or leisure time occupation for the residents of Cambridgeshire in the interests of social welfare and the promotion of healthy living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 18 November 2010: Standard registration
- CSCA (Working name)
- CASTLE SCHOOL CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Jordan | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MS ELLIOTT POXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY LANGRAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.20k | £89.20k | £56.31k | £36.06k | £53.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.89k | £70.88k | £21.44k | £41.26k | £111.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 September 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 November 2022 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 October 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 22 April 2021 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 06 JUL 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING CASTLE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL ASSISTANCE, FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL, OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE RESIDENTS OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY LIVING.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASTLE SCHOOL
COURTNEY WAY
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2EE
- Phone:
- 01223442400
- Email:
- csca@castle.cambs.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window