UNITED STOCKPORT CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£2,057,104
Donations and legacies | £10 | |
Charitable activities | £425.61k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.61k | |
Other | £1.62m |
Total expenditure:
£725,287
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £725.29k | |
Other | £0 |
-£10 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £725.29k | |
Retained for future use | £1.33m |
People

13 Employee(s)
44 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Stockport
Governance
- United Stockport Circuit (Working name)
- STOCKPORT METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
44 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Christopher Bennett | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Viki Packman | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Faulkner | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Heginbotham | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Cleary | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Laycock Deacon | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jason Smith | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kenneth Street | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Goodall | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Delafield | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Deacon Janet Amey | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Ball | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Lewis | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
JoAnne Roy | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Michael Aspinall | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Helen Stocks | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Phil Le Sueur | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Singleton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Owens | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Styles | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Katie Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ian Hamilton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David Bryant | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Deborah Pauline Mary Symmons | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Purves | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Meryl Blackburn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Goodall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Crutchley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Ollerenshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Hollins | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Bernard Rowlands | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JAYNE QUINN | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
IAN ERIC CHESTERS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Judith Adshead | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Penny Ollerenshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Dr Raj Bharat Patta | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
Judith Mottram | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Jones | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Prof Hugh McLaughlin | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET FOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EDDIE PARTINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSAN AINSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.52k | £475.72k | £738.90k | £581.12k | £2.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.82k | £369.41k | £544.61k | £596.84k | £725.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.44k | £0 | £10 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £425.61k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £30.87k | £762 | £14.61k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £706.60k | £580.36k | £1.62m | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £2.12k | £3.41k | £725.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £3.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £2.12k | £3.41k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £542.49k | £593.43k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £1.88m | £1.79m | £4.50m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £478.39k | £0 | £3.03m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £537.77k | £566.59k | £274.03k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £288.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2025 | 235 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2022 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2022 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) 11 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Tiviot Dale Methodist Church
Tiviot Dale
Stockport
SK1 1TA
- Phone:
- 03000110015
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window