BEANIBAZAR CANCER AND GENERAL HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Cancer Awareness, Treatment and Care especially for people residing in Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 02 December 2009: Standard registration
- THE BEANI BAZAR CANCER HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAMSUDDIN KHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHALIM UDDIN | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NASHIR UDDIN | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD SHAB UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.55k | £198.59k | £367.63k | £225.32k | £298.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.90k | £194.79k | £220.21k | £244.13k | £307.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS WITHIN THE UK AND BANGLADESH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE ERECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF A FULLY RESOURCE HOSPITAL IN THE GREATER AREA OF BEANI BAZAR, SYLHET, BANGLADESH FOR THE PURPOSES OF PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER. B) TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ALL SUCH MATTERS RELATING TO CANCER AND HEALTHCARE. C) TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND BANGLADESH WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE ORIGINATING FROM AND RESIDING IN BEANI BAZAR, SYLHET, BANGLADESH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. D) TO PROVIDE RELIEF, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM ANY FORM OF CANCER OR RELATED ILLNESSES.
Area of benefit
UK AND BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
74-76 Tower Bridge Road
London
SE1 4TP
- Phone:
- 02070960893
- Email:
- info@bbchospital.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window