THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SUTTON WITH SEAFORD

Charity number: 1131402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 10 December 2024: Funds received from 1118771 WAVES SEAFORD LIMITED
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • SEAFORD PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James William Hollingsworth Chair 24 September 2020
FITZGERALD CHARITY
Received: On time
Sally Thompson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Carole Kay Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Jackson Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Sue Topp Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Nicola Jane Ferguson Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Stephanie Norma Baker Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Paul Asher Waller Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Kim Hayley Cuthbert Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Morgan-Jones Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Lucy Elizabeth Borthwick Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Stefan Bracher Trustee 12 May 2021
NEWHAVEN YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: On time
Rev Lucy Jane Hollingsworth Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Lisa Anne Hazle Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Bridget Helen Anderson Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Michael Holmes Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Joanne Maria Lalla Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Anna Grimble Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
DERRECK LEE-PHILPOT Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Julia Lawson Trustee 15 March 2016
None on record
Janet Mary Kent Trustee 29 April 2014
SEAFRIENDS
Received: On time
CAPT ROBERT SYDNEY CARRINGTON CA Trustee 12 June 2013
None on record
FREDERICK JOHN MARSON BASS Trustee 17 May 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £238.62k £240.63k £234.51k £314.50k £746.17k
Total expenditure £296.50k £288.48k £280.53k £325.86k £356.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £675.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.57k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.22k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £29.55k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £503.13k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £310.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.45k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.68k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £42.19k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £511.00k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £581.58k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.40k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Leonard's Church
Church Street
Seaford
BN25 1HH
Phone:
01323872088