THE LEF-PILLON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funding to activities in the poorest nations and communities of the world, especially those benefiting marginalised groups such as children, women, and the disabled. We work through organisations who are formally equipped and trained to empower these groups. We work only with those initiatives with which we have a personal connection, and do not respond to unsolicited requests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Afghanistan
- Angola
- Bangladesh
- Belize
- Benin
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- East Timor
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- French Guiana
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkmenistan
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 23 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROLAND STEWART ANTHONY LUBETT | Chair | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Yvonne Lubett | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
TANYA BARRON | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phyllida Mary Bridget Shaw | Trustee | 04 October 2015 |
|
|||||
SARAH BRITTON HAVENS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.17k | £6.25k | £6.14k | £5.81k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.98k | £55.56k | £51.93k | £57.10k | £75.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PROJECTS, BODIES, AND ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 NORLAND SQUARE
LONDON
W11 4PZ
- Phone:
- 0061422515019
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window