RAF HONINGTON SERGEANTS' MESS

Charity number: 1131113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Military Mess for Senior Non-Commissioned Officers and Warrant Officers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £104,955
Total expenditure: £106,123

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 August 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maximillian Richard Charles Alan Hayward Trustee 11 January 2023
RAF HONINGTON OFFICERS' MESS
Received: On time
THE RAINBOW CENTRE (MARHAM)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £122.34k £34.96k £106.03k £95.85k £104.96k
Total expenditure £117.09k £30.19k £110.87k £93.12k £106.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 27 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 14 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 15 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Royal Air Force
RAF Honington
Bury St. Edmunds
IP31 1EE
Phone:
01359236958
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available