OFFICERS' MESS RAF VALLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITYÔÇÖS OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF MESS, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN. THE OBJECTS ALSO EXTEND TO MAKING GRANTS TO ANY ACTIVITY WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEE IS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 17 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Group Captain Gerard Currie | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.65k | £28.56k | £74.04k | £83.61k | £112.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.52k | £18.89k | £104.23k | £87.17k | £114.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 June 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
04 June 2021 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 1 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF MESS, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN. THE OBJECTS ALSO EXTEND TO MAKING GRANTS TO ANY ACTIVITY WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEE IS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL AIR FORCE
VALLEY
HOLYHEAD
LL65 3NY
- Phone:
- 01407762241
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window