THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHASE TERRACE AND BONEY HAY, ST. JOHN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim: to help people who do not know Jesus to become his faithful followers. Activities for senior citizens, children, young people, families & other groups. Support to UK & overseas charities. Provision of sacred space, public worship, rooms & facilities for community use. Pastoral & Teaching activities. School ministries. Events, meetings, literature, website and other media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. JOHN'S COMMUNITY CHURCH, BURNTWOOD (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MATTHEW WALLACE | Chair | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Betts | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Emery | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Moss | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Andrew McKeown Dr | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Sian Davies | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Louis | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Busby | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richards | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Minton | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Coe MBE | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Broome | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Boardman | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Procter | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Haywood | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annette Haywood | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Minton | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marg Nicholls | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Mark Phillip Tennant | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.26k | £106.04k | £112.09k | £130.65k | £184.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.87k | £100.46k | £112.08k | £159.30k | £162.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £450 | £500 | £1.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Community Church
High Street
Chase Terrace
BURNTWOOD
WS7 1LR
- Phone:
- 01543670078
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window