Financial history DAVENTRY MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1133432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/07/2020 03/07/2021 03/07/2022 03/07/2023 03/07/2024
Total gross income £6.50k £8.00k £8.75k £9.60k £12.50k
Total expenditure £6.00k £6.80k £7.15k £7.50k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A