THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BLACKHEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF ANGLICAN CHURCH SERVICES, CHILDREN'S AND YOUNG PEOPLE'S GROUPS AND ACTIVITIES, PRAYER GROUPS, CHARITABLE GIVING WITHIN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, CHRISTIAN YOUTH WORK, CHRISTIAN AGENCY AND MISSION WORK WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 16 September 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD DR NICHOLAS WILLIAM STEWART CRANFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amit Dhapre | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Williamson | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Christine Iolanda McInnes | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Cottrell | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Morkunas | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Patrick van IJzendoorn | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robert Furber | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darya Dougans | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petru-Cristian Calugaru | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MADELEINE DOWDING | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Foale Robinson | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charles Flewitt | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SWANN | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HEATH | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK MC FARLANE KIDD | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Josephine Beck | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ELISABETH DORRANCE-KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHERRY JACINTA ALMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.04k | £178.33k | £179.20k | £182.95k | £192.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.01k | £183.23k | £185.93k | £156.12k | £167.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2022 | 172 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2022 | 172 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 DUKE HUMPHREY ROAD
LONDON
SE3 0TY
- Phone:
- 02088524280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window