Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BLACKHEATH
Charity number: 1138076
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD DR NICHOLAS WILLIAM STEWART CRANFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew John Dunn | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robert Furber | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petru-Cristian Calugaru | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darya Dougans | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Monica De Bellotte | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Garratt | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Lawrenson Parker | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gail Exon | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ANTHONY QUARMBY CBE | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MADELEINE DOWDING | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Foale Robinson | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev THOMAS WILLIAM CHATTERTON | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SWANN | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jackson | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HEATH | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK MC FARLANE KIDD | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ELISABETH DORRANCE-KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE URSULA EANSWYTHE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHERRY JACINTA ALMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.