WARMINSTER HIGHBURY YOUTH FC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects (the Objects) are the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for playing of football
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Brunning | Chair | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Watts | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Mann | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Brunning | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.14k | £36.48k | £35.60k | £47.97k | £55.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.80k | £32.40k | £43.16k | £54.30k | £47.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
159 Goodwin Close
WARMINSTER
Wiltshire
BA12 0DE
- Phone:
- 07901936657
- Email:
- jennyhighburyfc@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window